+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #15
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 472)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 249)
- Read 3rd time
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 248)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §46 A- 2 - 121 - (Amended Code)
- §46 A- 1 - 105 - (Amended Code)
- §46 A- 2 - 115 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 472)
March 1, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 249)
March 1, 2016: Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 248)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor