+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #15
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 471)
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 199)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §31 A- 4 - 26 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 22 - 11 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 471)
February 26, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 199)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor