+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 221)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Trump Floor amendment #2 adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Trump Floor amendment #1 adopted (Voice vote)
- Romano Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 213)
- Motion to reconsider amendment adopted (Roll No. 214)
- Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 215)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/21
- On 2nd reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- § 6 C- 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 C- 2 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 C- 2 - 6 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 221)
March 26, 2021: Motion to reconsider amendment adopted (Roll No. 214)
March 26, 2021: Romano Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 213)
March 26, 2021: Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 215)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor