+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 125, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #19
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal #10
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 369)
- House Message received
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 438)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 434)
- Amendment ruled not germane
- Amendment ruled not germane
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 69)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 9 - 3 - 6 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 - 9 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 438)
March 8, 2016: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 434)
February 9, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 69)
February 12, 2015: Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1)
February 12, 2015: Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 1)
February 11, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 63)
February 11, 2015: Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 64)
February 2, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
February 2, 2015: Effective July 1, 2015 (Roll No. 2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor