+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (60)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House conference committee discharged
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- House reconsidered committee amendment
- House reconsidered Delegate Shott amendment #2
- Amendment adopted (Roll No 365)
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 366)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
- Conference time expired
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
- House appointed conferees: Manchin, Perdue, Shott
- Communicated to Senate
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Tucker, Kirkendoll, Nohe
- Communicated to House
- To conference
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed - Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 346)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 347)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 348)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Unanimous consent to amend
- Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 1)
- Ordered to House
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Jenkins Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 8)
- Carmichael Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- §60 A- 10 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 2 - 212 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 2 - 210 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 8 - (Repealed Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 10 - 4 a -
- § 5 N- 2 I- 2 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 8 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 5 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 12 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 6 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 4 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 10 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 11 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 9 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 2 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 7 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 1 - (New Code)
- § 5 B- 2 I- 3 - (New Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 13 a - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 4 A- 11 a - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 6 - 2 a - (New Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 6 a - (New Code)
- § 3 - 1 - 16 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 5 - 14 - (Amended Code)