+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/20
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- House Message received
- Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 612)
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 612)
- Completed legislative action
- To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal #578
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 654)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 653)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 156)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 156)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §50 - 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 1 - 10 a - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 2 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 2 A- 6 - (Amended Code)