+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 469)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Finance
- To Finance
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 209)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- Introduced in Senate
- To Pensions then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 5 - 10 - 15 c - (New Code)
- §18 - 7 A- 17 b - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 469)
February 27, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 209)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor