+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16
- Approved by Governor 3/21/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal #19
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal #10
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 536)
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- House received Senate message
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 537)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 354)
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 354)
- Title amendment adopted
- House Message received
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 429)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 428)
- Read 3rd time
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/8/16
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 176)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 176)
- Ordered to House
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 3 - 2 - 4 a - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 2 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 2 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 2 - 23 a - (New Code)
+ − Votes (8)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 536)
March 11, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 537)
March 9, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 354)
March 8, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 428)
March 8, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 429)
February 23, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 176)
February 23, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 176)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor