+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 119)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 119)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 2 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 3 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 4 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 5 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 6 - (New Code)
- § 5 A- 10 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 A- 10 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 17 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 119)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 119)
March 13, 2010: Passed House (Roll No. 376)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor