+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #21
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal #10
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 450)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 450)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 522)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 521)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 117)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 117)
- Ordered to House
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (22)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 2 a - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 2 b - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 10 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 11 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 12 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 14 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 14 a - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 15 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 18 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 19 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 20 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 24 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 25 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 26 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 27 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 28 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 30 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 B- 32 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 8 - 4 - (New Code)
- §64 - 8 - 3 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 450)
March 11, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 522)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 521)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 117)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 117)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor