+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 116)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 116)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (25)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 2 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 3 - (New Code)
- §18 - 1 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 E- 5 c - (Amended Code)
- §18 B- 1 - 1 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 - 1 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 B- 1 - 1 b - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 - 1 c - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 A- 1 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 A- 2 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 B- 8 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 B- 9 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 1 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 2 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 3 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 4 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 5 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 6 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 7 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 1 D- 8 - (New Code)
- §18 B- 3 B- 1 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 3 B- 2 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 11 - 5 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 B- 14 - 9 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 116)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 116)
March 6, 2008: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 365)
March 6, 2008: Effective from passage (Roll No. 367)
March 6, 2008: Passed House (Roll No. 366)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor