+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education
- Introduced in House
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 220)
- Ordered to House
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 7 g - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 27, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 220)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor