+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 114)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 114)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 2 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 114)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 114)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor