+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 113)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 113)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (26)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 2 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 3 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 4 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 5 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 6 - (New Code)
- §64 - 12 - 7 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 1 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 2 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 3 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 4 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 5 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 6 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 7 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 8 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 9 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 10 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 11 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 12 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 13 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 14 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 15 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 16 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 17 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 18 - (New Code)
- §17 H- 1 - 19 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 113)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 113)
March 13, 2015: Postpone Indefinitely (Roll No. 505)
March 4, 2015: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 17)
March 9, 2007: Passed House (Roll No. 430)
March 9, 2007: Effective from passage (Roll No. 431)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor