+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 112)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 112)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Judiciary
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- §64 - 12 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 12 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 12 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 12 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 12 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 - 16 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 - 16 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 1 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 2 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 3 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 4 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 5 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 6 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 7 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 8 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 9 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 10 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 L- 11 - (New Code)
- §24 - 1 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §24 - 3 - 3 b - (Repealed Code)
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 112)
February 16, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 112)
March 14, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 602)
March 14, 2015: Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 62)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 430)
February 21, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 15)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor