+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/3016 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 564)
- The bill still being in possession of the clerk
- Taken up for further consideration
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 520)
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 208)
- Ordered to House
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 2 - 10 b - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 564)
February 27, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 208)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor