+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal #11
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Completed legislative action
- Passed House (Roll No. 450)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/9/16
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 187)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 1 - 1 - 6 - (New Code)
- §21 - 3 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 A- 10 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §24 - 2 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 450)
February 24, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 187)
March 10, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 426)
February 28, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor