+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - Senate Journal #57
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal #2804
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal #48
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 426)
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 16)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Having been read 1st time 2/19/14
- Reported do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading to Judiciary
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Natural Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §46 - 9 - 515 - (Amended Code)