+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 21)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 21)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §29 - 3 - 11 - (Amended Code)