+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 517)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 520)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 246)
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 247)
- Ordered to House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 3 - 29 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 520)
March 1, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 247)
March 1, 2016: Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 246)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor