+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 221, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #21
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #15
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 519)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 267)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- Introduced in Senate
- To Pensions then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §16 - 5 V- 2 - (Amended Code)