+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal #288
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 487)
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 487)
- House Message received
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 610)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 611)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 572)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Motion bill be committed to Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 477)
- With amendment, do pass
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 273)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 273)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading to Finance
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- §17 A- 10 - 3 a - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 1 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 2 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 3 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 4 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 5 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 8 - (Repealed Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 9 - (Repealed Code)
- §46 A- 6 - 107 a - (New Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 16 - 6 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 2019: Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 487)
March 8, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 610)
March 8, 2019: Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 611)
March 7, 2019: Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 572)
February 27, 2019: Passed Senate (Roll No. 273)
February 27, 2019: Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 273)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor