+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 207)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 200)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §17 C- 15 - 49 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 22 A- 10 d - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 22 A- 10 e - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 11 - 31 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 207)
February 26, 2016: Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 200)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor