+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 5/1/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal #3161
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal #45
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal #3154
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal #38
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Deferred
- From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 469)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 120)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
- Ordered to House
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- On 1st reading
- Committee substitute reported
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- § 3 - 10 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 3 a - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 4 a - (Repealed Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 9 - (New Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 10 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 469)
April 1, 2013: Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor