+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 196)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- §33 - 26 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 26 - 18 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 13 A- 2 - (Amended Code)