+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- To House Energy
- To Energy then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 171)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Motion
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
- Originating in Senate Energy, Industry and Mining
+ − Statute Amended
- §11 - 6 A- 5 s - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 22, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 171)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor