+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 274)
- On 3rd reading
- Senate requests return of bill from House
- Senate reconsidered action (voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 286)
- Ordered to House
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 250)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- §29 - 21 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 13 a - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 9 a - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 274)
March 29, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 286)
March 28, 2017: Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 250)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor