+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 449)
- Read 3rd time
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/9/16
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 166)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Ordered to House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- § 5 - 16 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 - 16 - 12 a - (Amended Code)
- §23 - 4 - 3 - (Amended Code)