+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal #292
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/8/19
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal #2241
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 319)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 400)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 142)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- §60 A- 4 - 417 - (New Code)