+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 518)
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass, but first to Finance
- To House Finance
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 100)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 2/11/16
- On 2nd reading
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- § 5 - 16 - 22 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 14 - 15 - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 14 - 19 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 518)
February 15, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 100)
March 9, 2007: Passed House (Roll No. 397)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor