+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 174)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 170)
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Senator Stollings requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Blair requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §55 - 7 - 30 - (New Code)