+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - Senate Journal #19
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 382)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 383)
- Completed legislative action
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 132)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 132)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (27)
- §24 A- 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 46 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 46 - 18 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 46 - 21 - (New Code)
- §33 - 46 - 22 - (New Code)
- §33 - 46 - 23 - (New Code)
- §33 - 46 - 24 - (New Code)
- §15 - 10 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 10 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 7 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 4 a - (New Code)
- §20 - 14 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §20 - 14 - 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §20 - 14 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 14 - 10 - (New Code)
- §20 - 14 - 11 - (New Code)
- §20 - 14 - 12 - (New Code)
- §20 - 15 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 15 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 29 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 6 - (Amended Code)