+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reference dispensed
- Introduced in House
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 193)
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- §60 A- 4 - 401 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2020: Passed Senate (Roll No. 193)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor