+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in House
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 271)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Economic Development then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §31 - 15 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 271)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor