+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 9, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/196 - Senate Journal #288
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 416)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 417)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 533)
- Passed House (Roll No. 532)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in House
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 108)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 108)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- §16 - 7 - 5 - (New Code)
- §16 - 7 - 5 a - (Repealed Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 1 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 2 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 3 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 4 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 5 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 6 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 7 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 8 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 9 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 10 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 11 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 12 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 13 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 14 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 15 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 16 - (New Code)
- §19 - 11 E- 17 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 417)
March 7, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 533)
March 7, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 532)
February 11, 2019: Effective from passage (Roll No. 108)
February 11, 2019: Passed Senate (Roll No. 108)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor