+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 465)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 108)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- §44 D- 5 - 503 a - (New Code)
- §44 D- 5 - 503 b - (New Code)
- §44 D- 5 - 503 c - (New Code)
- §44 D- 5 - 505 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 1 - 20 - (New Code)
- §60 - 3 A- 18 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 1 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 - 11 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 465)
February 16, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 108)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor