+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #20
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 444)
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 444)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 436)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 435)
- Read 3rd time
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 434)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 197)
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 197)
- Ordered to House
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- §31 - 15 C- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 7 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 10 - (Repealed Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 11 - (Repealed Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 14 - (Repealed Code)
- §11 - 27 - 38 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (10)
April 7, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 444)
April 7, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 444)
April 6, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 436)
April 6, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 435)
April 6, 2017: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 434)
March 24, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 197)
March 24, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 197)
March 12, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 477)
February 28, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor