+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 241)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §23 - 2 C- 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 241)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor