+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/18
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal #463
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal #457
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal #0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 373)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 374)
- Completed legislative action
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Do pass, but first to Finance
- To House Finance
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- To Government Organization then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 158)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 158)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- § 6 - 9 - 1 a - (Amended Code)
- § 6 - 9 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 - 9 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 - 9 - 9 a - (Amended Code)
- § 6 - 9 - 9 b - (New Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2018: Effective from passage (Roll No. 374)
March 7, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 373)
February 20, 2018: Effective from passage (Roll No. 158)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 158)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor