+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14
- Approved by Governor 3/27/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal #56
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal #2803
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal #48
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 414)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 83)
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture and Rural Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §19 - 1 - 11 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 414)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor