+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #18
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 563)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 509)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 640)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 91)
- Ordered to House
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §33 - 31 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 46 A- 9 - (Amended Code)