+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/13 - House Journal #3159
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/13 - Senate Journal #42
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/15/13 - House Journal #2898
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/15/13
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5)
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 5)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 214)
- House reconsidered effective date
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 211)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended to include the provisions of H. B. 2722
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reference dispensed
- Introduced in House
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 8)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- Introduced in Senate
- To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- §24 B- 5 - 3 - (Amended Code)