+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/2/16 - House Journal #961
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/2/16 - Senate Journal #9
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/2/16
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 2/29/16 - House Journal #898
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/29/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 190)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 190)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 180)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 179)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 130)
- Ordered to House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §29 - 22 - 18 d - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 14 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 190)
February 25, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 190)
February 24, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 180)
February 24, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 179)
February 17, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 130)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor