+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/25/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal #3160
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal #42
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal #3145
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal #27
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 260)
- Completed legislative action
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
- To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- Introduced in Senate
- To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §22 - 3 - 20 - (Amended Code)
- §22 - 3 - 21 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 260)
April 1, 2013: Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor