+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/14/18
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal #463
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/14/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/14/18 - Senate Journal #453
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 378)
- Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 378)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 347)
- Passed House (Roll No. 346)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 101)
- Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 101)
- Ordered to House
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- §11 - 27 - 38 - (Amended Code)