+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/21
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/21
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/21 - Senate Journal #507
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/19/21 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 4/13/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/21 - Senate Journal #481
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 493)
- Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 503)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 318)
- House Message received
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 400)
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment adopted (Roll No. 399)
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment pending
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 103)
- Ordered to House
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 3/8/21
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §17 C- 15 - 49 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 15 - 49 a - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2021: Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 503)
April 6, 2021: Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 318)
April 1, 2021: Amendment adopted (Roll No. 399)
April 1, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 400)
March 9, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 103)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor