+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (70)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/26/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal #3161
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal #45
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal #3146
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal #31
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Conference report filed - House
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed - Senate
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 118)
- Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 118)
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 467)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 468)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
- Conference report received-House
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
- Ordered to House
- House Message received
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
- House appointed conferees: Morgan, Swartzmiller, Azinger
- Communicated to Senate
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Snyder, Miller, Boley
- To conference
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 252)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 253)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over on 2nd reading, House Calendar, until 4/8/13
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- To House Government Organization
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- On 2nd reading
- Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 3)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 4)
- Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 4)
- Ordered to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- On 1st reading
- Committee substitute reported
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (17)
+ − Statute Amended
- § 8 - 1 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (9)
April 13, 2013: Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 118)
April 13, 2013: Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 468)
April 13, 2013: House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 467)
April 13, 2013: Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 118)
April 11, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 252)
April 11, 2013: Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 253)
March 7, 2013: Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 3)
March 7, 2013: Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 4)
March 7, 2013: Passed Senate (Roll No. 4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor