+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal #11
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 447)
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 90)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- §33 - 24 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 25 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 25 A- 24 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 25 D- 26 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 1 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 2 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 3 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 4 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 5 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 6 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 7 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 8 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 9 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 10 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 11 - (New Code)
- §33 - 40 A- 12 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 447)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 90)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor