+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §16 - 4 - 19 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 3 C- 2 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 29, 2013: Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor