+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- To Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 137)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 134)
- Read 2nd time
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 2/16/16
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 7 - 1 - 3 d - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 17 - 12 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 137)
February 17, 2016: Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 134)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor